CA ACR62 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Attractions and Parks Day.
Title
California Attractions and Parks Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Assembly - ACR 62 Quirk-Silva Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1372.) |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A., E., S., & T. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | From printer. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |