CA ACR47 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Hearing: Apr 22 @ 3:00 pm in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the CAL FIRE Firefighter Braden Varney Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CAL FIRE Firefighter Braden Varney Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-07AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-03-06AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback