CA ACR190 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-19-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 139, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-19-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 139, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Juneteenth.
Title
Juneteenth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-08 - Senate - Special Consent ACR190 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 139, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-19 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4686.) |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 9). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |