CA ACR19 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-19)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Black History Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Black History Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]
Sen. Steven Bradford [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Sen. Holly Mitchell [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Special Consent ACR19 Weber et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2019.
2019-03-11AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2019-03-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-03-07SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 307.)
2019-02-28SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-02-20SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-02-12SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-02-11AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 319.)
2019-02-11AssemblyCoauthors Revised.
2019-02-07AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 7).
2019-02-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-31AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-01-30AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback