CA AB857 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2810.5 of, and to add Section 2810.6 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employers: Labor Commissioner: required disclosures.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Sen. Maria Durazo [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 857 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB857 Kalra et al. By Durazo (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 857 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB857 Kalra et al. By Durazo (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 857 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 14.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 5203.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Durazo. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 21. Page 1328.) |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (April 21). |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2810.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2810.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |