CA AB761 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 10.1 (commencing with Section 10100) to the Public Resources Code, relating to resource conservation.
Title
Carbon sequestration: working lands.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 761 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 761 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and E.Q. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 11. Page 1918.) |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 13). |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and W., P., & W. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 10100 | New Code | See Bill Text |