CA AB75 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-13 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-13 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17070.25, 17070.50, 17071.75, 17072.30, 17072.35, 17073.15, 17074.16, 17074.25, 17075.15, and 17077.35 of, to add Sections 17070.42, 17070.59, 17073.16, 17074.265, and 17075.20 to, to add Article 10.7 (commencing with Section 17077.60) and Article 11.5 (commencing with Section 17078.40) to Chapter 12.5 of Part 10 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, to add Part 71 (commencing with Section 101410) to Division 14 of Title 3 of, and to repeal and add Section 17075.10 of, the Education Code, relating to education finance, by providing the funds necessary therefor through an election for the issuance and sale of bonds of the State of California and for the handling and disposition of these funds, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Education finance: school facilities: Kindergarten-Community Colleges Public Education Facilities Bond Act of 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 75 O'Donnell Third Reading Urgency (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 1840.). |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 20). |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. |
2020-12-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 17070.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17070.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 17070.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17070.59 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 17071.75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17072.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17072.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17073.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17073.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 17074.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17074.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17074.265 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 17075.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17075.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 17077.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |