CA AB70 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 24200) to Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to gene synthesis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gene synthesis providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 70 Salas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB70 Salas et al. By Pan (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 70 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-05AssemblyVetoed by Governor.
2021-09-13 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-07AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 0.).
2021-09-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.).
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-12SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-08SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 7).
2021-06-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2.)
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-04-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6).
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code24200New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback