CA AB690 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 747, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 4980.01, 4980.43, 4980.43.2, 4980.43.3, 4980.43.4, 4980.46, 4992.10, 4996.14, 4996.15, 4996.23, 4996.23.1, 4996.23.2, 4996.23.3, 4999.22, 4999.46, 4999.46.2, 4999.46.3, 4999.46.4, and 4999.72 of, to amend and renumber Section 4999.24 of, and to add Sections 4980.05, 4980.06, 4996.14.1, 4996.14.2, 4999.25, and 4999.26 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage and family therapists: clinical social workers: professional clinical counselors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 690 Arambula Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB690 Arambula By Roth (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 690 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 747, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-20 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
2021-09-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-09-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-01SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.)
2021-05-28AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-05-28AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2021-05-27AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Arambula.
2021-04-22AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Arambula.
2021-04-22AssemblyFrom Consent Calendar.
2021-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
2021-04-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-03-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2021-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code4980.01Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.05New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4980.06New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4980.43Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.43.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.43.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.43.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.46Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4992.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4996.14Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4996.14.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4996.14.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4996.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4996.23Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4996.23.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4996.23.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4996.23.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.22Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.25New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4999.26New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4999.46Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.46.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.46.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.46.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.72Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback