CA AB62 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Part 2.57 (commencing with Section 10609.90) of Division 6 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Statewide water storage: expansion.
Sponsors
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Juan Alanis [R] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Asm. Diane Dixon [R] |
Asm. Bill Essayli [R] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] |
Asm. Joe Patterson [R] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Asm. Juan Carrillo [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] | Asm. Tri Ta [R] | Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D] |
Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2023-02-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2022-12-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10609.90 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |