CA AB600 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1172.1 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure: resentencing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18).
2023-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 18).
2023-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
2023-03-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-14AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2023-03-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2023-03-07AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2023-02-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2023-02-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
2023-02-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1172.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback