CA AB590 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 108, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 108, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 20309 of the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement.
Title
Public employees’ retirement: membership election.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB590 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 590 MEDINA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 590 MEDINA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 108, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1842.). |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1617.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 20309 | Amended Code | Citation Text |