CA AB552 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 434, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 434, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 7203 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public works contracts: damages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Assembly - AB 552 O'DONNELL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB552 O'Donnell By Jackson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - AB 552 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB552 O'Donnell By Jackson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - AB 552 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 434, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3059.). |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2641.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-06-23 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1385.) |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10500.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 7203 | New Code | See Bill Text |