CA AB537 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 785, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 785, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3505.1 of, and to add Section 3505.8 to, the Government Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Meyers-Milias-Brown Act: impasse procedures.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 537 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB537 Bonta By Beall (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 537 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB537 Bonta By Beall (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 537 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 785, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 3298.). |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2356.). |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2013-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 1791.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3505.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3505.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3505.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 3507 | Amended Code | Citation Text |