CA AB498 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.104 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB498 Aguiar-Curry By Dodd Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Assembly - AB 498 Aguiar-Curry Third Reading Urgency (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Assembly - AB 498 Aguiar-Curry Third Reading Urgency (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-05-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-05-18 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1053.). |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1407.). |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1298.) |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 1167.) |
2023-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12012.104 | New Code | See Bill Text |