CA AB498 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 430, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 430, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14087.59 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: county organized health system: Orange County Health Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 498 Quirk-Silva Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB498 Quirk-Silva et al. By Min (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB498 Quirk-Silva et al. By Min (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 498 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB498 Quirk-Silva et al. By Min (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB498 Quirk-Silva et al. By Min (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 498 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 430, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5235.). |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Senate Rules Suspended |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1605.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7). |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14087.59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |