CA AB468 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 192, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 192, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 99171 and 99172 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transit districts.
Title
Transit districts: prohibition orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-21 - Assembly - AB 468 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB468 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 468 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB468 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 468 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 192, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2678.). |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2070.). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1482.) |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 99171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |