CA AB358 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 148, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 148, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 835 of the Civil Code, relating to electrified security fences.
Title
Electrified security fences: permitted use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-23 - Assembly - AB 358 Flora Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB358 Flora et al. By Ochoa Bogh (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 358 Flora Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB358 Flora et al. By Ochoa Bogh (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 358 Flora Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 148, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-08-31 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-08-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2465.). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2072.). |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1715.) (June 29). |
2021-06-15 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1584.) |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 835 | Amended Code | Citation Text |