CA AB352 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10201, 10202, 10212, 10213, 10223, 10224, 10230, 10235, 10237, 10239, 10246, 10251, 10252, 10255, and 10262 of, to amend the heading of Division 10.2 (commencing with Section 10200) of, to amend the heading of Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 10230) of Division 10.2 of, to add Sections 10213.5, 10215.3, 10215.5, 10221.5, 10223.5, and 10231.3 of, to repeal Sections 10234 and 10244 of, and to repeal Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 10270) of Division 10.2 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to agricultural land.
Title
Agricultural land conservation: California Farmland Conservancy Program Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB352 |
Text | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB352#99INT |