CA AB3104 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-05 - Referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-05 - Referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1753 of, and to add Sections 1751.8, 1751.9, 1756.1, 1756.2, 1756.3, and 1756.4 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
California Travel Insurance Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 3104 Valencia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5635.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 1751.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 1751.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 1753 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1756.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 1756.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 1756.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 1756.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |