CA AB2902 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 721, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 721, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25270.2, 25270.3, 25270.4, 25270.4.5, 25281.5, 25285, 25292.3, 25299.78, and 25510 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous substances.
Title
Hazardous substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2902 E.S. & T.M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By QUIRK (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2902 E.S. & T.M. (Quirk) By Gaines (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2902 E.S. & T.M. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2902 E.S. & T.M. (Quirk) By Gaines (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2902 E.S. & T.M. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 721, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6896.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.) |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5877.). |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4646.) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25270.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25270.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25270.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25270.4.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25281.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25285 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25292.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.78 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |