CA AB2820 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 75013 to, and to repeal Part 46.5 (commencing with Section 75000) of Division 7 of Title 3 of, the Education Code, relating to community colleges, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
The California Online Community College.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2820 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 4708.) |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 75000 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 75013 | New Code | See Bill Text |