CA AB2776 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-10 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-10 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 1746) to Chapter 10.5 of Part 2 of Division 2 of the Water Code, relating to the State Water Resources Development System.
Title
Transfers of water: agricultural use to municipal use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Natural Resources and Water Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Assembly - AB 2776 W., P.& W. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Natural Resources and Water Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Assembly - AB 2776 W., P.& W. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-10 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2010-08-09 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2010-07-15 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-07-01 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) (June 29). | |
2010-06-28 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2010-06-17 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-06-16 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2010-06-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). | |
2010-06-02 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-05-13 | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W. | |
2010-04-29 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-04-29 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4943.) | |
2010-04-22 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 21). | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2010-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2010-04-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2010-03-02 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 1. | |
2010-03-01 | Read first time. To print. |