CA AB2774 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 17 (commencing with Section 12100.180) of Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to childcare.
Title
Childcare for Working Families Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2774 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2774 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E. D. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and B., P. & E. D. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and J., E.D., & E. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12100.180 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |