CA AB2759 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7503.14 and 7505.3 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to collateral recovery.
Title
Collateral recovery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2759 Obernolte Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2759 Obernolte By Jones (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2759 Obernolte Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2759 Obernolte By Jones (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2759 Obernolte Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5343.). |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4360.). |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4728.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and PUB. S. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7503.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7505.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |