CA AB2733 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 3090) to Chapter 8 of Title 1 of Part 3 of the Penal Code, relating to parole.
Title
Parolee substance use disorder treatment.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Choi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3090 | New Code | See Bill Text |