CA AB2733 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 150, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 150, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3254.1 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to disability compensation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Disability compensation: voluntary plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Assembly - AB 2733 INS. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By PEREA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2733 Committee on INS. (Perea) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 2733 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2733 Committee on INS. (Perea) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 2733 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 150, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5736.). |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4145.). |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4601.). |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2014-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 3254.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |