CA AB2677 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1798.3, 1798.17, 1798.20, 1798.24, 1798.24b, 1798.25, 1798.26, 1798.27, 1798.55, 1798.57, and 1798.68 of the Civil Code, relating to information privacy.
Title
Information Practices Act of 1977.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2677 Gabriel et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2677 Gabriel Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2677 Gabriel et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB2677 Gabriel et al. Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB2677 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2677 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2677 Gabriel Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2677 Gabriel et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB2677 Gabriel et al. Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB2677 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2677 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5239.). |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4997.) |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hertzberg. |
2022-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4987.) | |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5000.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.68 | Amended Code | Citation Text |