CA AB2551 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 100, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 100, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 29880, 30372, and 30472 to the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Assembly - AB 2551 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2551 McCarty et al. By Nielsen (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2551 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2551 McCarty et al. By Nielsen (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2551 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 100, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-07-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-07-01 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.). |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 19.) |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4532.). |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2022-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 4613.) |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 29880 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 30372 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 30472 | New Code | See Bill Text |