CA AB2551 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 760, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 760, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 60.6 (commencing with Section 20928) to Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, relating to water.
Title
Contract procurement: surface storage projects.
Sponsors
Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2551 GALLAGHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2551 Gallagher By Nielsen (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2551 GALLAGHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2551 Gallagher By Nielsen (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2551 GALLAGHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 760, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 2. Page 6441.). |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 5313.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-08-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 4902.) |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 20928 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 79714.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |