CA AB2524 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 159, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 159, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Sections 12200.1 and 12200.3 of the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions.
Title
Check Sellers, Bill Payers and Proraters Law: out-of-state activities.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2524 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments By REYES (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2524 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2524 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2524 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2524 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 159, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5354.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4379.). |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2020-07-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 4819.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 12200.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 12200.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |