CA AB2517 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 11 (commencing with Section 20000) to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to poverty.
Title
California Coordinated Neighborhood and Community Services Grant Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D] |
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2517 Mia Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2517 Mia Bonta et al. By Hurtado (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2517 Mia Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2517 Mia Bonta et al. By Hurtado (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2517 Mia Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5212.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4939.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 20000 | New Code | See Bill Text |