CA AB2488 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-11 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-11 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 8 (commencing with Section 62450) to Title 6 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Downtown revitalization and economic recovery financing districts: City and County of San Francisco.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2488 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2488 Ting By Wiener (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2488 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2488 Ting By Wiener (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2488 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5.). |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 2). |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and HOUSING. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1.) |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | (Pending re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D.) |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4775.) |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 62450 | New Code | See Bill Text |