CA AB2474 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4210 and 4212 of the Public Resources Code, relating to fire prevention, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Fire prevention fee: state responsibility areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Assembly - Amend, and re-refer to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Assembly - Amend, and re-refer to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-05-16 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-08 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2012-04-25 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Amend and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 23). | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |