CA AB2417 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 132415 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Metro Gold Line Foothill Extension Construction Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 132415 | Amended Code | Citation Text |