CA AB240 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 100190 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Local health department workforce assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Assembly - AB 240 Rodriguez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB240 Rodriguez et al. By Pan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 240 Rodriguez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB240 Rodriguez et al. By Pan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 240 Rodriguez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5017.). |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-07-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). |
2021-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1595.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 100190 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |