CA AB237 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-07 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2810 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: inspection of loads.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 237 CARTER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-07-07 In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
2009-06-18 Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2009-06-11 Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2009-06-10 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 9).
2009-05-21 Referred to Com. on T. & H.
2009-05-14 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-14 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1467.)
2009-05-11 Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
2009-05-07 From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6).
2009-04-27 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-23 Read second time and amended.
2009-04-22 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14).
2009-03-26 Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2009-02-07 From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2009-02-06 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code2810Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_237&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_237_bill_20090206_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_237_bill_20090423_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_237_bill_20090611_amended_sen_v97.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_237_vote_20090414_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_237_vote_20090506_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_237_vote_20090514_1123AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_237_vote_20090609_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback