CA AB2361 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 33126.3 to the Education Code, relating to school districts.
Title
School districts: school accountability report card:
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2361 PAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-21 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 4916.) | |
2012-05-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-10 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (May 9). | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33126.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |