CA AB235 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12934 to the Government Code, relating to employment.
Title
Civil Rights Department: Labor Trafficking Unit.
Sponsors
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Asm. Laurie Davies [R] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2023-02-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and PUB. S. |
2023-01-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. |
2023-01-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12934 | New Code | See Bill Text |