CA AB2303 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-11 - Referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-11 - Referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4000.7 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: registration: installment payments.
Sponsors
Asm. Van Tran [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 0 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |