CA AB2251 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 824, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 824, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 12.5 (commencing with Section 28100) to the Financial Code, relating to student loan servicers.
Title
Student loan servicers: licensing and regulation:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2251 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2251 Mark Stone By Leno (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2251 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2251 Mark Stone By Leno (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2251 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 824, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 6540.). |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5487.). |
2016-08-25 | Senate | From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 25). |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29). |
2016-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 24. Page 5188.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (May 27). |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 18). |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and B. & F. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 70050 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22660 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 28100 | New Code | See Bill Text |