CA AB2234 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 651, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 651, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65589.5 of, and to add Sections 65913.3 and 65913.3.5 to, the Government Code, relating to planning and zoning.
Title
Planning and zoning: housing: postentitlement phase permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2234 Robert Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2234 Robert Rivas et al. By Kamlager (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2234 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2234 Robert Rivas et al. By Kamlager (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2234 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 651, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 5061.). |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4921.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65589.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65913.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65913.3.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |