CA AB2182 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 5898.15, 5898.23, and 5899.1 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to contractual assessments.
Title
Contractual assessments: onsite sewer and septic
Sponsors
Asm. Jared Huffman [D] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2182 HUFFMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2182 Huffman By Liu (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Assembly - AB 2182 HUFFMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2182 Huffman By Liu (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Assembly - AB 2182 HUFFMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6645.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 6685.) | |
2010-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 4840.) | |
2010-08-23 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-12 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-11 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. (Corrected August 12.) | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 30). | |
2010-06-16 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-06-09 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-06-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-05-20 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-05-06 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-06 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 6. Page 5028.) | |
2010-05-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 28). | |
2010-04-05 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. (Corrected April 8.) Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-02-19 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |