CA AB2143 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 774, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 774, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 769.2 and 913.13 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Net energy metering: construction of renewable electrical generation facilities: prevailing wage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2143 Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2143 Carrillo et al. By Bradford (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2143 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2143 Carrillo et al. By Bradford (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2143 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 774, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 16.). |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 5361.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 29). |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 15). |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and L., P.E. & R. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 5030.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on L. & E.) |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and L. & E. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 769.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 913.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |