CA AB211 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17072 of, and to add and repeal Section 17206.2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income taxes: deduction: California qualified tuition program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 211 Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB211 Calderon et al. By McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB211 Calderon et al. By McGuire Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB211 Calderon et al. By McGuire (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 211 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB211 Calderon et al. By McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB211 Calderon et al. By McGuire Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB211 Calderon et al. By McGuire (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 211 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-13 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3120.). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2525.). |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2524.) |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hurtado. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2518.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1922.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 15. |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17072 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17206.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |