CA AB2076 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 31541.1 to the Government Code, relating to county employees’ retirement.
Title
County employees’ retirement: disability: date of retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2076 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Assembly - AB 2076 RODRIGUEZ Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Assembly - AB 2076 RODRIGUEZ Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-07-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5040.). |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4379.) |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 14). |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2018-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 31541.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |