CA AB2037 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 8350) to Division 4.1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: air pollution.
Sponsors
Asm. Manuel Perez [D] | Asm. Mary Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-19 - Assembly - AB 2037 PEREZ, V.M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2037 V. Manuel Perez By Pavley (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2037 PEREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2037 V. Manuel Perez By Pavley (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2037 PEREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-08-26 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-19 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 6373.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6392.) | |
2010-08-18 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-18 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4596.) | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 15). | |
2010-05-20 | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and EQ. | |
2010-05-10 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-10 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 26. Page 5081.) | |
2010-05-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 28). | |
2010-04-20 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 19). | |
2010-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2010-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-06 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 5). | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. | |
2010-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2010-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |