CA AB1999 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 739.9 of, and to add and repeal Section 913.7 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: fixed charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 5174.) |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | (Pending re-refer to Com. on APPR.) |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5139.) |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on U. & E. and APPR. |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 739.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |