CA AB1972 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 210 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Sections 890, 896, 900, 901, 903.3, and 905.5 of, and to add Section 913.5 to, the Penal Code, relating to grand juries.
Title
Grand juries.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1972 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1972 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 17.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 15). |
2022-03-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 890 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 896 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 903.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 905.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 913.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |