CA AB1954 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 495, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 495, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.31 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.202 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: reproductive health care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1954 BURKE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1954 Burke By Mitchell (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1954 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1954 Burke By Mitchell (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1954 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 495, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 19. Page 6341.). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 5253.). |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 22). |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 4894.) |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (May 4). |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (April 19). |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2016-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.202 | New Code | See Bill Text |